FRIENDS OF BY BROOK VALLEY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOBBVS primarily fundraises to assist the school with additional equipment. It is currently looking to provide an outside sensory garden and to replace the hi fi sound system currently used in the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 January 2001: Standard registration
- FOBBVS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Avent | Chair | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Frances | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.32k | £9.11k | £7.37k | £2.22k | £5.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.23k | £12.21k | £1.70k | £689 | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 672 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 March 2022 | 623 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BROOK VALLEY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BY Brook Valley Primary School
The Street
Yatton Keynell
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 7BA
- Phone:
- 07884343060
- Email:
- fobbvs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window