PARSON DROVE AMENITIES 95 MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities of the user groups include line dancers, table tennis, short mat bowls, Kung Fu classes, needlecraft group, the school, the Chapel, the Church, John Peck Society, Parish Council, Football club, Cricket Club, Keep Fit, Youth Club and private bookings for members of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 20 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN KILLINGWORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dianne Cutler | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michele Dawson | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary McMullen | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Booth | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Tania Cook | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ossianna Byrnes | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Killingworth | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Reader | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Hunt | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Colin Killingworth | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SHELLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.54k | £44.37k | £30.72k | £30.29k | £46.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.71k | £20.57k | £35.78k | £47.50k | £46.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.52k | N/A | £2.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2024
(These accounts |
27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2023 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 AUG 2000 AS AMENDED ON 14 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS PARSON DROVE VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PARSON DROVE IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PARSON DROVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Common Bank
Throckenholt
SPALDING
PE12 0QX
- Phone:
- 01945700744
- Email:
- alank1975@live.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window