THE HITE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Not active
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 December 2000: Standard registration
- 07 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2004 | 30/11/2005 | 30/11/2006 | 30/11/2007 | 30/11/2008 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2006 | 28 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2005 | 17 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG WOMEN AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION OF HIGHER EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG WOMEN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND GRANTS TO ENABLE SUCH WOMEN TO PURSUE COURSES OF HIGHER EDUCATION OR TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH PROJECTS; (B) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF (A) ABOVE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG WOMEN IN THE FOLLOWING SUBJECT AREAS: (1) PHYSICAL SCIENCES (11) SOCIAL SCIENCES, INCLUDING TOWN PLANNING, DEVELOPMENT, RACE RELATIONS AND GENDER STUDIES (111) HUMANITIES (IV) BUSINESS AND FINANCE (V) ECOLOGY, HORTICULTURE AND NATURE STUDIES; (C) IN PURSUANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS TO ARRANGE FOR THE PROVISION AND ASSIGNMENT OF MENTORS TO ASSIST WOMEN IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR STUDIES; AND (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window