HARROW MUSEUMS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a Collection of objects and records representing the history of the businesses and people of the London Borough of Harrow. The Collection is used to advance the education of the public about the London Borough of Harrow and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Harrow
Governance
- 20 September 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Joan Diane Gandy PhD FBDA | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Howard Andrew Greenwood | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Thomas Eynon | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ERIC PENNELLS | Trustee | 29 December 2012 |
|
|||||
ROBIN YOULE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £14 | £13 | £17 | £29 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £13 | £28 | £73 | £38 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF MUSEUM SERVICES.
Area of benefit
HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrow Museum
Headstone Manor
Pinner View
HARROW
Middlesex
HA2 6PX
- Phone:
- 07951422767
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window