NOTTINGHAM WILDCATS COMMUNITY BASKETBALL AND SPORTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During 2008 the charity has built a ·750,000 extension to the facility as part of a drive to increase participation in sport. The charity's pricing policy has enabled the local community to access the existing and new facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 04 January 2001: Standard registration
- JESSE BOOT COMMUNITY BASKETBALL AND SPORTS TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jake Meskell | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Jane Rose | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ian Ford | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Blankley | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Wharton | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARTHUR WILLIAM BUTTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID PRIOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £393.52k | £393.25k | £415.28k | £509.86k | £496.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £389.95k | £411.44k | £465.15k | £583.67k | £484.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.03k | £75.81k | £77.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.18k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £416.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £77.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £583.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £72.57k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 August 2020 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 August 2020 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/04/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE EAST AREA OF THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PERSONS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
EAST AREA OF THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottingham Wildcats Arena
Greenwood Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 7EB
- Phone:
- 01159150108
- Email:
- c.prior2@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window