Financial history We Are All Making A Difference Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1086708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £308.40k £43.90k £15.39k £54.19k £97.81k
Total expenditure £274.29k £220.93k £160.45k £99.06k £106.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A