TRADDODIADAU CERDD CYMRU/ MUSIC TRADITIONS WALES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
trac exists to promote and develop the music traditions of Wales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £138,419 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 07 March 2001: Standard registration
- TRAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF JAMES BLYTHE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gwenno Roberts | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ywain Myfyr | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisa Morris | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart Robb | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Hugh Jones | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.14k | £115.48k | £161.35k | £129.54k | £143.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.92k | £97.41k | £121.84k | £189.05k | £159.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £960 | £138.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE USE OF TRADITIONAL AND TRADITION - BASED ARTS INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MUSIC, SONG AND DANCE, BY ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO INCREASE PARTICIPATION AND RAISE STANDARDS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gorphwysfa Chapel
New Road
Skewen
NEATH
West Glamorgan
SA10 6YF
- Phone:
- 07467184143
- Email:
- trac@trac-cymru.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window