THE THAME AND OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The encouragement of agriculture generally. This includes further education and improvement in the care and breeding of agricultural livestock, domestic animals,produce, pets and horticulture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 January 2001: Standard registration
- THAME AND OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY SHOW (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ANDREW DUFFY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Henry Ovens | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY JOHNSON | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOPCROFT | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hubert John East | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
William Nixey | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRAHAM BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN STANLEY READ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK HENRY DENHAM BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN MIDWINTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
David Bretherton | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA MARION MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER JAMES CARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON JOAN CAPEWELL ABRAHAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.92k | £14.50k | £20.78k | £26.21k | £29.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £4.77k | £7.61k | £10.12k | £9.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF AGRICULTURE GENERALLY, FURTHER EDUCATION AND IMPROVEMENT IN THE CARE AND BREEDING OF ALL AGRICULTURAL LIVESTOCK, DOMESTIC ANIMALS, PETS, PRODUCE AND HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
N F U Office
Windmill Hill
Great Milton
OXFORD
OX44 7NW
- Phone:
- 01844278755
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window