FOUNDATION FOR WATER RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to advance the education of the public in the science, engineering and management of water resources, water treatment, water supply and use of water, the collection, treatment and re-use of wastewaters, the water environment in general and related subjects, in particular, by disseminating the useful results of relevant research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2001: Standard registration
- FWR (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Woods | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ERIC MACDONALD VALENTINE | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY JOHN RACHWAL | Trustee | 16 October 1997 |
|
|
||||
DR RODNEY WHITE C ENG FICE FCIWEM | Trustee | 24 October 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £194.34k | £152.37k | £164.11k | £80.61k | £11.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £513.06k | £416.46k | £609.39k | £1.11m | £1.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 264 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1953, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12TH JANUARY 2001 18TH JULY 2001 AND 18 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SCIENCE, ENGINEERING AND MANAGEMENT OF WATER RESOURCES, WATER TREATMENT, WATER SUPPLY AND USE OF WATER; THE COLLECTION, TREATMENT AND RE-USE OF WASTEWATERS, THE WATER ENVIRONMENT IN GENERAL AND RELATED SUBJECTS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seymour Taylor
40 Oxford Road
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP11 2EE
- Phone:
- 01628891589
- Email:
- office@fwr.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window