FRIENDS OF COMPTON BISHOP CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support to the fabric of St Andrews Church and its Churchyard in Compton Bishop, Somerset. Funds are raised through voluntary annual membership subscription and by various fund-raising activities from time to time throughout each financial year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 January 2001: Standard registration
- FCBC (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MICHAEL ROLFE | Chair | 15 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Pauline Jean Warner | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DEAN | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Anne Dean | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £2.64k | £2.99k | £2.71k | £1.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £1.07k | £1.15k | £2.19k | £2.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PRESERVE OR ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD OF ST. ANDREW IN THE PARISH OF COMPTON BISHOP IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET AS AN ANCIENT BUILDING OF BEAUTY AND HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD OF ST. ANDREW IN THE PARISH OF COMPTON BISHOP IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honeysuckle Cottage
Church Lane
Compton Bishop
AXBRIDGE
Somerset
BS26 2HB
- Phone:
- 07720814141
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window