Financial history THE COUNTESTHORPE U3A

Charity number: 1084302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.17k £7.39k £42.02k £67.38k £65.51k
Total expenditure £71.36k £6.52k £44.99k £65.09k £64.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £200