Trustees THE COUNTESTHORPE U3A
Charity number: 1084302

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Talbot | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Norris Mr | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Norris | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Brown | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HETTERLEY | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ivatt | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Hebblewhite | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janine Tibbles | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JILL CLAYTON | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARRY HILLYARD | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BERYL LISHMAN | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.