Financial history FRIENDS OF BILLINGHAY CE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1084355
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £914 £2.53k £0 £0 £496
Total expenditure £801 £2.38k £211 £211 £212
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A