THE FLYING DUCKS YOUTH THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with young people in the York area to enhance their drama and social skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of York
Governance
- 24 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenna Howlett | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Howlett | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Newbold | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.80k | £8.24k | £7.54k | £19.50k | £26.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.39k | £11.60k | £8.01k | £19.19k | £28.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £350 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCTOBER 2000 AND 18 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF DRAMA AND THE PERFORMING ARTS 2) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Swarthdale
Haxby
YORK
YO32 3NZ
- Phone:
- 07783 133690
- Email:
- flyingducksyork@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window