IRISH DIASPORA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training Arts and cultural activities Environmental/conservation and heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN LOGAN | Chair | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Michael Gorman | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FRANCIS CONNOLLY | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||
PAUL EZEKIEL STANION | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BERNARD KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSE MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL FORDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.47k | £119.65k | £298.11k | £269.43k | £240.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £484.73k | £72.30k | £306.27k | £384.49k | £425.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.68k | £14.03k | £15.14k | £4.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 January 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/2000 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/11/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WHETHER ALONE OR JOINTLY WITH OTHERS ABOUT THE IRISH DIASPORA BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM WITHIN A BUILDING TO BE KNOWN AS THE IRISH WORLD HERITAGE CENTRE (THE "CENTRE") TO INFORM THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HERITAGE OF IRELAND AND ITS HISTORY AND CULTURE IN DANCE, MUSIC, LITERATURE, ART AND SPORT; (B) TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL TRAINING COURSES FOR THE PUBLIC AT THE CENTRE IN THE ART, MUSIC, LITERATURE, SPORT AND DANCE OF IRELAND AND TO FACILITATE EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGES WITH ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS IN IRELAND; (C) TO SEEK TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE CHEETHAM HILL AREA OF MANCHESTER AND THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION AS TO SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS (THE "RESIDENTS") BY FACILITATING THE ASSOCIATION TOGETHER OF THE RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS INCLUDING SUPPORTING LOCAL AUTHORITY INITIATIVES TO CREATE EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESIDENTS; (D) TO PROMOTE AMONG RESIDENTS PARTICIPATION IN RECREATIONAL AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING, ALONE OR JOINTLY WITH OTHERS, FACILITIES AT THE CENTRE FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE CULTURE OF IRELAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Irish World Heritage Centre
1 Irish Town Way
MANCHESTER
M8 0AE
- Phone:
- 01612054007
- Email:
- manager@iwhc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window