LONGBOROUGH FESTIVAL OPERA

Charity number: 1087303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote, maintain, improve and advance education of the public through support and encouragement of the art of music. To promote, maintain, improve and advance education of the local community by organising and conducting performances of opera and collaborating with local schools, music students to providing opportunities to attend workshops, rehearsals, performances

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 2001: Standard registration
  • 25 August 2023: Funds received from 1156439 THE SIR MICHAEL MCWILLIAM FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Miles Mosely Chair 01 September 2023
THE COSMAN KELLER ART AND MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Joseph Pillman Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Iain James Hasnip Trustee 10 October 2024
REHEARSAL ORCHESTRA
Received: On time
Stephen Leslie Barter Trustee 10 October 2024
GABRIELI
Received: On time
MRS E M B GRAHAM Trustee 08 April 2022
None on record
Annita Clinton Trustee 08 October 2020
None on record
Alexandra Mackesy Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record
Leo Martin Robert Graham Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.25m £1.69m £2.35m £2.85m £3.56m
Total expenditure £795.81k £2.03m £2.37m £2.50m £3.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.11k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.24m £1.07m £1.32m £1.12m £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £660 £114.06k £161.13k £202.52k £245.30k
Income - Charitable activities £10.54k £503.92k £873.56k £1.07m £1.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £181 £313 £2.64k £13.11k
Income - Other £1.31k £0 £0 £450.04k £615.81k
Income - Legacies £0 £109.00k £12.84k £0 £50.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £795.73k £1.97m £2.30m £2.42m £3.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £59.05k £72.39k £82.46k £80.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £13.09k £37.73k £46.41k £45.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £11.68k £5.17k £7.41k £34.46k £108.94k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.46m £1.13m £1.16m £1.42m £1.44m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £125.51k £124.36k £173.88k £112.88k £123.09k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 10 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 23 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NEW BANKS FEE
LONGBOROUGH
MORETON-IN-MARSH
GL56 0QF
Phone:
01451 830 292