Financial history Rape Crisis South London

Charity number: 1085104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.22m £1.32m £1.51m £2.80m £3.40m
Total expenditure £1.05m £1.21m £1.35m £2.37m £3.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £773.83k £889.14k £1.44m £2.67m £3.33m
Income - Donations and legacies £31.87k £31.70k £24.04k £22.96k £21.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £29.49k £90.24k £27.50k
Income - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.25m £1.44m £2.67m £3.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £878 £3.94k £1.76k £6.78k £17.66k
Income - Other £107.05k £32.47k £15.00k £877 £484
Income - Legacies £0 £13.87k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.10m £1.35m £2.37m £3.15m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £80.92k £0 £48.93k £21.36k £16.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £109.66k £0 £0 £0