THE BUDDHIST COMMUNITY CENTRE LETCHWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To Serve the community with Buddhist teaching and practices 2. To conduct meditation classes to help and lead a peaceful life. 3. To provide/assist in the provision of facilities to carry out Buddhist and Sri Lankan cultural functions . 4. To advance the Buddhist way of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 12 October 2001: Standard registration
- LETCHWORTH BUDDHIST VIHARA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GALPAYAGE UPUL MAHINDA JAYAWARDANE | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAYANTHA KARUNADASA | Trustee | 03 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
DILIP GUNAWARDANA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHANDANI SANDAYA DIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DELAPALAGE HARISCHANDRA KODAGODA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr YASA SIRI RAJAPAKSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.75k | £33.44k | £26.37k | £27.64k | £36.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.06k | £27.47k | £28.78k | £27.64k | £35.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 29TH JULY 2001 AS AMENDED 22 AUGUST 2004 AND 18 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LETCHWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BUDDHIST INHABITANTS 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION 2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR A BUDDHIST COMMUNITY CENTRE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES 4) TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST FAITH
Area of benefit
LETCHWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Wilbury Farm
Hitchin Road
ARLESEY
SG15 6SF
- Phone:
- 01462 835645
- Email:
- info@letchworthtemple.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window