FAIRFIELDS COMMUNITY SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities and equipment for the education of pupils with physical difficulties, severe and profound multiple learning difficulties and multi-sensory impairment at Fairfields Community Special School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £76,805 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 March 2001: Standard registration
- FAIRFIELDS SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Usher | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wood | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Elder | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Clarkson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £994 | £5.44k | £2.41k | £2.53k | £118.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £2.94k | £5.56k | £4.33k | £117.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £76.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS WITH PHYSICAL DIFFICULTIES SEVERE AND PROFOUND MULTIPLE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND MULTI SENSORY IMPAIRMENT AT FAIRFIELDS COMMUNITY SPECIAL SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY AVENUE
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 6JN
- Phone:
- 01604714777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window