NEW CENTURY ARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing training, support, resources, and networking opportunities for early-career talent in the creative industries and arts. Looking to set up an online forum where people can swap ideas, advice, and contacts, as well as setting up their own projects. Also developing new creative work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2001: Standard registration
- 13 August 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.10k | £4.53k | £0 | £1.24k | £513 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.18k | £4.08k | £52 | £1.19k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 20 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 18 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, CONCERT PERFORMANCES, PRESENTATIONS, READINGS, SEMINARS AND CLASSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window