Accounts and annual returns DUCHESS OF KENT HOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 1085912
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required