Governing document DUCHESS OF KENT HOUSE CHARITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICK AND INFIRM PERSONS AND THOSE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE PALLIATIVE CARE AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERED FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE WEST BERKSHIRE PRIORITY CARE SERVICE NHS TRUST AND ANY SUCCESSORS TO THE SAID TRUST AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING FOR THE BEREAVED FAMILIES OF PATIENTS WHO HAVE RECEIVED SUCH CARE.
Area of benefit
WEST BERKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.