HOSSEINIEH FOUNDATION FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To promote and propagate Islam, the religion of Allah (SWT), as thought by the Prophet Mohammad (P.B.U.H.) and the Holly Ahlul-bait. b) to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Bristol by advancing education and providing facilities in the interest of social welfare with the object of improving the education of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

12 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 July 2001: Standard registration
- DARUL-IMAAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ghulam qasim shah | Chair | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NASIR SHIEKH | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZOHAIB HASSAN Co TREAS | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYED NAJAF SAJJAD HUSSAIN JOINT-SEC | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYED ALI SHAH | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
imran hussein | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rizwan Hussain | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR Naeem | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mobeen Ali | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Manzoor Hussain | Trustee | 01 October 1999 |
|
|
||||
Jevade Sadiq | Trustee | 01 October 1999 |
|
|
||||
Syed Asghar Shah | Trustee | 01 October 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.10k | £12.27k | £14.77k | £20.15k | £29.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.10k | £12.24k | £9.90k | £23.54k | £25.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 421 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 421 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/07/2000 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2001
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND PROPAGATE ISLAM, THE RELIGION OF ALLAH (SWT), AS TAUGHT BY THE PROPHET MOHAMMED (P.B.U.H.) AND THE HOLY AHLUL-BAIT. B) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRISTOL BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Apsley Street
Eastville
Bristol
BS5 6SP
- Phone:
- 01174012239
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window