CHARLTON DOWN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision Of Community Building Facilites
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 09 May 2003: Standard registration
- HERRISON HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor David Thorpe | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Goddard | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Morcia Ankcorn | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aysha Vanderman | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Wyatt | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Henry Herring | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Thorpe | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.92k | £37.46k | £26.19k | £48.58k | £30.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.99k | £23.67k | £29.33k | £86.02k | £40.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.00k | £24.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2015
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHARLTON DOWN IN THE PARISH OF CHARMINSTER, NR. DORCHESTER, DORSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY COUNTY OF DORSET AND SOUTH SOMERSET (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A VILLAGE HALL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE HALL") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
CHARLTON DOWN IN THE PARISH OF CHARMINSTER, NR. DORCHESTER, DORSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY COUNTY OF DOREST AND SOUTH SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Charlton Down Village Hall
Sherren Avenue
Charlton Down
DORCHESTER
Dorset
DT2 9UA
- Phone:
- 07792 784496
- Email:
- diane.thorpe8@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window