Accounts and annual returns AVON VALLEY RAILWAY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1088545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 10 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 28 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 31 January 2022 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 31 January 2022 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 25 February 2021 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 18 March 2021 108 days late Download Open in new window