Trustees DEBRA
Charity number: 1084958

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES FRANCIS IRVINE | Chair | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Briggs | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Install | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel William Mundy | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simone Bunting | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Colin Talbot | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PARRY THOMAS | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carly Fields | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christo Kapourani | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Bendor-Samuel | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.