Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ('RCCG') REDEMPTION PARISH

Charity number: 1084772
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £211.33k £147.19k £143.48k £183.89k £222.90k
Total expenditure £177.32k £126.15k £124.73k £140.37k £195.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A