THE FRIENDS OF ST. AIDAN'S CHURCH, LEEDS

Charity Number: 1090661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE RESTORATION , REPAIR, RENEWAL OF THE FABRIC OF ST. AIDAN'S CHURCH LEEDS, WHICH IS A GRADE 2 LISTED BUILDING

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £234
Total expenditure: £60

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2002: Standard registration
  • 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 29 May 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Winston Case Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Maureen Hall Trustee 13 October 2019
None on record
Pepper Carolynne Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record
GLENDORA PATRICIA CASE Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
MARGARET PATRICIA STOUTE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.20k £2.20k £1.88k £234 £234
Total expenditure £7.88k £2.55k £1.10k £45 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 August 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 September 2020 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 GLEDHOW PARK VIEW
LEEDS
LS7 4JS
Phone:
07989814131
Website:

No information available