Accounts and annual returns EDUCATION BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1093728
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 16 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 16 May 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 22 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 22 May 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 24 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 24 May 2011 On Time