Accounts and annual returns FAYE WILLIAMS MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1085519
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required