THE HORBURY HERITAGE COMMUNITY BUILDING PRESERVATION AND MANAGEMENT TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Horbury Heritage Trust, on behalf of the community, is watchful of land, listed and non-listed buildings within Horbury. It is trustee of Primrose Hall Charity. The hall is a vibrant community assett employing a part-time Caretaker and Hall Administrator with voluntary helpers. It is also in the process of negotiating a lease with Wakefield Council to take over management of Green Park, Horbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 May 2002: Standard registration
- HORBURY HERITAGE TRUST LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL CHARLES CUDWORTH | Chair | 19 August 2002 |
|
|||||||
Thomas William Randall | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Sandra Walker | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
Christopher John Randall | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
Irene Marion Randall | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|||||||
KEITH STANLEY FORMAN | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET CUDWORTH | Trustee | 14 December 2000 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH ANN WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88 | £24 | £2.66k | £19.03k | £15.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £13 | £13 | £1.27k | £6.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 22 MARCH 2002, 3 DECEMBER 2002 AND 15 MARCH 2005 as amended on 23 May 2019 as amended on 27 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the charity is to preserve for the benefit of the people of Horbury and of the Nation, the historical uses, and architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in and around Horbury in buildings (including any building as defined in Section 336 of the Town and Country Planning Act 1990) of particular beauty or historical, architectural, constructional or local interest, together with land and land use.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 BEECHWOOD GROVE
HORBURY
WAKEFIELD
WF4 5JQ
- Phone:
- 01924272619
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window