JAYWICK MILLENNIUM LUNCH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide a weekly healthy lunch time menu with a choice with both main and dessert courses; together with cold and hot drinks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 21 February 2002: Standard registration
- JAYWICK COMMUNITY LUNCH CLUB (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYLVIA MAY HOBBS | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.84k | £145 | £4.14k | £6.70k | £6.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.03k | £174 | £3.67k | £7.10k | £7.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 28TH SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ELDERLY AND DISABLED PEOPLE LIVING IN JAYWICK IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW AND HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A LUNCHEON CLUB 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PARENTS IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW AND HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A LUNCHEON CLUB TO PARENTS AND THEIR PRE-SCHOOL AND SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN
Area of benefit
JAYWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOLF GREEN HALL
GOLF GREEN ROAD
JAYWICK
CLACTON-ON-SEA
CO15 2RH
- Phone:
- 01255425003
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window