FRIENDS OF ISRAEL SPORTS CENTRE FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 1086205

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Continuing raising of monies through application and personal requests and to raise monies through investments in sporting activities for the disabled.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,790
Total expenditure: £78

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • FISCD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN HARRIS Chair
None on record
JEREMY HARRIS Trustee
None on record
HAROLD MAURICE NEWMAN Trustee
None on record
JANE CATHERINE JUKES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.36k £96.56k £34.81k £29.79k £41.79k
Total expenditure £85.98k £101.43k £32.14k £30.16k £78
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 September 2024 225 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 September 2024 225 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 MARYLEBONE HIGH STREET
LONDON
W1U 4LZ
Phone:
02079355541