Financial history THE RAINA AND SYDNEY LEVY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1086166
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £612 £20 £62 £286 £69
Total expenditure £1.55k £1.70k £1.73k £1.90k £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A