Financial history SPALDING AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1087068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £117.83k £0 £1 £9.73k £107.58k
Total expenditure £99.60k £5.61k £6.65k £10.02k £88.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A