TETBURY RAIL LANDS REGENERATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A charity and rural social enterprise established to regenerate the land and buildings comprising the former Tetbury Branch Line in Gloucestershire and, through the activities and performances in the Tetbury Goods Shed Arts Centre, to promote the Arts and advance education in the Arts through inclusion, social engagement and wellbeing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Warrington | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Durning | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona E James | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Louise Henry | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Coleman | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Wright | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Ian Hodson | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL PATON | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS LOOMAN | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.81k | £180.14k | £190.80k | £217.59k | £252.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.82k | £132.56k | £201.61k | £229.72k | £247.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.69k | £33.15k | £14.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
A CHARITY AND RURAL SOCIAL ENTERPRISE ESTABLISHED TO DEVELOP MAINTAIN AND REGENERATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE LAND AND BUILDINGS COMPRISING THE FORMER TETBURY BRANCH LINE AND, THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES AND PERFORMANCES IN THE TETBURY GOODS SHED ARTS CENTRE, TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS THROUGH INCLUSION, SOCIAL ENGAGEMENT AND WELLBEING?
Area of benefit
TETBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Station Yard
Cirencester Road
TETBURY
- Phone:
- 01666505496
- Email:
- office@shed-arts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window