Financial history LIVING WATERS FOURSQUARE CHURCH

Charity number: 1084921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.71k £35.48k £44.93k £49.20k £41.88k
Total expenditure £24.86k £23.49k £30.17k £39.22k £43.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A