Financial history THE ALDERLEY EDGE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1085217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.10k £1.62k £9.69k £10.02k £10.38k
Total expenditure £7.38k £1.88k £9.57k £8.45k £9.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A