Trustees THE ALDERLEY EDGE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 1085217

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER DOWLING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Jagger | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Roberts | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Bernette Cusick | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Shotton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Webb | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Brophy | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Joy Alsop | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIA CHRISTINE DICKINSON | Trustee | 09 April 1981 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.