NEW LIFE IN CHRIST MINISTRIES- NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Life in Christ Ministries is a non denominational, bible based, Christian church offering religious worship services, Bible studies and other community activities on a weekly basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 July 2001: Standard registration
- NLICM (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Augustus Thompson | Chair | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Bosworth | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Roosevelt | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Agness Mkandawire Bwalya | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA COBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.45k | £57.76k | £59.89k | £70.86k | £52.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.50k | £59.41k | £63.84k | £50.34k | £59.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2024 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2024 | 241 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 19TH JUNE 2001 as amended on 28 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ION ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE FOURTH SCHEDULE HERETO AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES BY ANY MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE: 2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK: 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS. IN PRINCIPLE NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 GREENFIELDS AVENUE
HARROGATE
HG2 7BN
- Phone:
- 07886205503
- Email:
- info@newlifeinchrist.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window