THE AISLING PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aisling provides supported holidays in Ireland for long-term Irish emigrants living in London who require assistance to become reaquainted with their homeland and their friends and family. Aisling gives advice and assistance to long-term Irish emigrants living in London who wish to resettle in Ireland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 February 2001: Standard registration
- AISLING RETURN TO IRELAND PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Woulfe | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MULVIHILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AONGHUS FITZGIBBON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.54k | £182.70k | £196.10k | £157.04k | £103.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.31k | £161.43k | £157.23k | £118.52k | £138.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £117.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OF PEOPLE OF IRISH ORIGIN WHO ARE HOMELESS, ISOLATED OR OTHERWISE VULNERABLE AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Resource For London
The Aisling Project
356 Holloway Road
LONDON
N7 6PA
- Phone:
- 02076974203
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window