Financial history SOUTH NORMANTON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1085935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £172.12k £173.75k £172.81k £181.52k £147.74k
Total expenditure £159.95k £146.60k £185.76k £176.71k £178.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.88k £4.15k £1.88k N/A