Financial history FRIENDS OF GROOMBRIDGE PRIMARY SCHOOL (FGPS)

Charity number: 1085037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.79k £10.14k £6.70k £28.75k £27.93k
Total expenditure £26.43k £20.53k £10.42k £5.33k £30.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A