EAST GRINSTEAD U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of educational activities among older people and the encouragement of social gatherings. Achieved by the creation of separate self help groups under the umbrella of our organisation. Typical groups include; singing, gardening, science, arts, conversation, languages, discussion, photography, walking, etc. We currently have over 60 such groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 08 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Elizabeth Hodgson | Chair | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Lea | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Wade | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Francis | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Dorothy Taylor | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Valerie Whitfield | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Michael Wood | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Trigg | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Charles Mason | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS WELLS | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.67k | £44.51k | £33.55k | £44.79k | £46.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.78k | £46.95k | £34.49k | £38.36k | £44.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25 JUNE 1995 & AMENDED 20 NOVEMBER 2001 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
EAST GRINSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Willow Close
EAST GRINSTEAD
West Sussex
RH19 2DQ
- Phone:
- 01342-327452
- Email:
- Chair@eastgrinsteadu3a.co.uk
- Website:
-
eastgrinstead.u3asite.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window