HILDA BLACK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust provides grants to Charities in connection with improving the quality of life of persons in the United Kingdom suffering from visual handicaps, hearing impairment, terminal illness and the alleviation of poverty in other countries. Where practicable and reasonable the trustees pay such funds to Roman Catholic organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Blankstone | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||
PETER FRANCIS WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
VERONICA ROSE WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MICHAEL DAVID BLANKSTONE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.58k | £13.70k | £14.11k | £13.58k | £9.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.94k | £22.37k | £23.35k | £22.55k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL PROBATE OFFICE ON 11 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
1. IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF VISUALLY HANDICAPPED PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND. 2. IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM HEARING IMPAIRMENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. 3. THE CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL ILLNESS OR DISEASE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. 4. THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY AND DEPRIVATION IN COUNTRIES OTHER THAN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blankstone Sington Ltd
Walker House
Exchange Flags
Liverpool
L2 3YL
- Phone:
- 0151 236 8200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window