Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ANNE OF CLEVES HOUSE

Charity number: 1086390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.59k £1.18k £2.37k £2.70k £3.59k
Total expenditure £921 £417 £1.45k £1.58k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A