THE REDDITCH ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1086399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Redditch Orchestra is local amateur orchestra open to any players of orchestral instruments with a playing standard of at least Grade VI. It is organised on an 'evening class' basis with weekly rehearsals during 'school' term time cullminating in a concert performance at the end of every term.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,210
Total expenditure: £3,912

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE REDDITCH ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD CROOK Chair
None on record
Helen Green Trustee 22 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.34k £268 £220 £2.46k £3.21k
Total expenditure £1.35k £132 £1.09k £3.22k £3.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hillcrest
Three Cocks Lane
Offenham
Evesham
WR11 8RY
Phone:
07970187939