FOREST OF ARDEN YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forest of Arden Youth for Christ aim to promote the Christian Faith by encouraging positive Christian living throughout the local community. We work with local schools & churches providing a range of activities for young people including youth clubs RE lessons playground duty assistance & school assemblies. This enables us to provide support to local young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 07 June 2001: Standard registration
- 10 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FOREST OF ARDEN YFC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.99k | £16.25k | £32.23k | £22.59k | £31.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.95k | £25.41k | £26.74k | £30.10k | £35.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 28 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | 03 March 2011 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 07 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 09 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 30 March 2009 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 08 July 2009 | 130 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN HENLEY-IN-ARDEN AND STUDLEY AND THEIR ENVIRONS AND TO THIS END B) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN HENLEY-IN-ARDEN AND STUDLEY AND THEIR ENVIRONS C) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING D) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window