LIVING WORD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church meetings held every Sunday via online platform (as a result of COVID-19 restrictions) - interactive service, praise and worship, prayer, the Word, ministry in response to needs Regularly 'Destined for Greatness' youth forum Regular Prayer-Care /Small Group meetings Outreach, Action against poverty through partnerships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 March 2001: Standard registration
- 19 March 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1202201 LIVING WORD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- LIVING WORD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.01k | £34.16k | £24.88k | £24.45k | £21.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.41k | £22.26k | £21.06k | £16.09k | £17.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 18 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 3 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN LONDON AND THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH IN LONDON AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN LONDON AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window