PEOPLES CLUB OF NIGERIA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity Number: 1093698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is established particularly for persons of Nigerian origin in London and surburbs to advance education, relieve poverty, preserve and protect health and provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life of such persons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,154
Total expenditure: £18,018

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 September 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Okechuku Ashley Mpi Chair 01 October 2023
None on record
Chikwendu Ibeakanma Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
CHINEDU NWOSU Trustee 28 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.38k £9.96k £17.92k £13.69k £7.15k
Total expenditure £26.29k £6.05k £12.26k £32.22k £18.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 April 2025 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2023 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2023 675 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 April 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
75 Hunters Grove
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 9AD
Phone:
07802836255
Website:

No information available